Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Wyden, Ron [D-OR] 04/13/2011
Sen. Blumenthal, Richard [D-CT] 05/02/2011
Sen. Moran, Jerry [R-KS] 05/12/2011
Sen. Begich, Mark [D-AK] 05/19/2011
Sen. Johnson, Tim [D-SD] 05/23/2011