Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Crapo, Mike [R-ID]* 03/31/2011
Sen. Enzi, Michael B. [R-WY]* 03/31/2011
Sen. Cantwell, Maria [D-WA]* 03/31/2011
Sen. Schumer, Charles E. [D-NY]* 03/31/2011
Sen. Merkley, Jeff [D-OR]* 03/31/2011
Sen. Portman, Rob [R-OH] 11/03/2011
Sen. Leahy, Patrick J. [D-VT] 01/24/2012
Sen. Blunt, Roy [R-MO] 01/30/2012
Sen. Begich, Mark [D-AK] 01/30/2012
Sen. Murray, Patty [D-WA] 02/01/2012
Sen. Feinstein, Dianne [D-CA] 02/09/2012
Sen. Shaheen, Jeanne [D-NH] 08/01/2012