Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Enzi, Michael B. [R-WY]* 03/31/2011
Sen. Cardin, Benjamin L. [D-MD]* 03/31/2011
Sen. Landrieu, Mary L. [D-LA]* 03/31/2011
Sen. Lugar, Richard G. [R-IN]* 03/31/2011
Sen. Menendez, Robert [D-NJ]* 03/31/2011
Sen. Roberts, Pat [R-KS]* 03/31/2011
Sen. Isakson, Johnny [R-GA] 04/06/2011
Sen. Johnson, Tim [D-SD] 04/06/2011
Sen. Cochran, Thad [R-MS] 04/13/2011
Sen. Wicker, Roger F. [R-MS] 04/13/2011
Sen. Ensign, John [R-NV] 04/14/2011
Sen. Risch, James E. [R-ID] 04/14/2011
Sen. Hutchison, Kay Bailey [R-TX] 05/05/2011
Sen. Moran, Jerry [R-KS] 05/05/2011
Sen. Brown, Sherrod [D-OH] 05/19/2011
Sen. Thune, John [R-SD] 05/25/2011
Sen. Blunt, Roy [R-MO] 06/22/2011
Sen. Chambliss, Saxby [R-GA] 06/29/2011
Sen. Heller, Dean [R-NV] 04/25/2012
Sen. Hagan, Kay R. [D-NC] 05/09/2012
Sen. Boozman, John [R-AR] 06/06/2012