Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Barrasso, John [R-WY] 04/07/2011
Sen. Enzi, Michael B. [R-WY] 04/07/2011
Sen. Crapo, Mike [R-ID] 04/07/2011
Sen. Johanns, Mike [R-NE] 04/07/2011
Sen. Lugar, Richard G. [R-IN] 04/07/2011
Sen. Risch, James E. [R-ID] 04/07/2011
Sen. Chambliss, Saxby [R-GA] 04/07/2011
Sen. Cochran, Thad [R-MS] 04/07/2011
Sen. Burr, Richard [R-NC] 04/07/2011
Sen. Blunt, Roy [R-MO] 04/07/2011
Sen. Moran, Jerry [R-KS] 04/07/2011
Sen. Grassley, Chuck [R-IA] 04/07/2011
Sen. Boozman, John [R-AR] 04/12/2011
Sen. Thune, John [R-SD] 04/13/2011
Sen. Inhofe, James M. [R-OK] 05/04/2011
Sen. Hoeven, John [R-ND] 05/10/2011
Sen. Vitter, David [R-LA] 05/10/2011