Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Graham, Lindsey [R-SC]* 04/04/2011
Sen. Sessions, Jeff [R-AL] 04/05/2011
Sen. Johanns, Mike [R-NE] 04/05/2011
Sen. Boozman, John [R-AR] 04/05/2011
Sen. Ensign, John [R-NV] 04/05/2011
Sen. Johnson, Ron [R-WI] 04/05/2011
Sen. Collins, Susan M. [R-ME] 04/05/2011
Sen. Toomey, Pat [R-PA] 04/05/2011
Sen. Lee, Mike [R-UT] 04/05/2011
Sen. Barrasso, John [R-WY] 04/05/2011
Sen. Roberts, Pat [R-KS] 04/05/2011
Sen. Crapo, Mike [R-ID] 04/05/2011
Sen. Isakson, Johnny [R-GA] 04/05/2011
Sen. Chambliss, Saxby [R-GA] 04/05/2011
Sen. Burr, Richard [R-NC] 04/05/2011
Sen. Rubio, Marco [R-FL] 04/05/2011
Sen. Cornyn, John [R-TX] 04/05/2011
Sen. Hatch, Orrin G. [R-UT] 04/05/2011
Sen. Coburn, Tom [R-OK] 04/05/2011
Sen. Inhofe, James M. [R-OK] 04/05/2011
Sen. Alexander, Lamar [R-TN] 04/05/2011
Sen. Cochran, Thad [R-MS] 04/05/2011
Sen. Wicker, Roger F. [R-MS] 04/05/2011
Sen. Snowe, Olympia J. [R-ME] 04/05/2011
Sen. McCain, John [R-AZ] 04/05/2011
Sen. Enzi, Michael B. [R-WY] 04/05/2011
Sen. Blunt, Roy [R-MO] 04/06/2011
Sen. Kyl, Jon [R-AZ] 04/06/2011
Sen. Risch, James E. [R-ID] 04/07/2011
Sen. Grassley, Chuck [R-IA] 05/02/2011
Sen. Corker, Bob [R-TN] 05/19/2011
Sen. Lugar, Richard G. [R-IN] 10/19/2011
Sen. McConnell, Mitch [R-KY] 10/20/2011
Sen. Hoeven, John [R-ND] 10/20/2011
Sen. Shelby, Richard C. [R-AL] 10/20/2011
Sen. Coats, Daniel [R-IN] 11/01/2011
Sen. Murkowski, Lisa [R-AK] 11/01/2011
Sen. Ayotte, Kelly [R-NH] 11/01/2011
Sen. Kirk, Mark Steven [R-IL] 11/02/2011
Sen. Portman, Rob [R-OH] 11/02/2011
Sen. Moran, Jerry [R-KS] 11/03/2011
Sen. Paul, Rand [R-KY] 11/07/2011
Sen. Hutchison, Kay Bailey [R-TX] 02/01/2012

Show cosponsors who withdrew