Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Snowe, Olympia J. [R-ME]* 04/05/2011
Sen. Inhofe, James M. [R-OK]* 04/05/2011
Sen. Murkowski, Lisa [R-AK]* 04/05/2011
Sen. Hoeven, John [R-ND]* 04/05/2011
Sen. Casey, Robert P., Jr. [D-PA]* 04/05/2011
Sen. Ayotte, Kelly [R-NH] 04/06/2011
Sen. Portman, Rob [R-OH] 04/06/2011
Sen. Collins, Susan M. [R-ME] 04/06/2011
Sen. Johanns, Mike [R-NE] 04/06/2011
Sen. Cornyn, John [R-TX] 04/06/2011
Sen. Enzi, Michael B. [R-WY] 04/06/2011
Sen. Kyl, Jon [R-AZ] 04/06/2011
Sen. DeMint, Jim [R-SC] 04/06/2011
Sen. Ensign, John [R-NV] 04/06/2011
Sen. Lee, Mike [R-UT] 04/06/2011
Sen. Thune, John [R-SD] 04/06/2011
Sen. Crapo, Mike [R-ID] 04/06/2011
Sen. Chambliss, Saxby [R-GA] 04/06/2011
Sen. Blunt, Roy [R-MO] 04/06/2011
Sen. Burr, Richard [R-NC] 04/06/2011
Sen. Johnson, Ron [R-WI] 04/06/2011
Sen. Stabenow, Debbie [D-MI] 04/06/2011
Sen. Hatch, Orrin G. [R-UT] 04/06/2011
Sen. Roberts, Pat [R-KS] 04/06/2011
Sen. Grassley, Chuck [R-IA] 04/06/2011
Sen. Rubio, Marco [R-FL] 04/06/2011
Sen. Graham, Lindsey [R-SC] 04/06/2011
Sen. Toomey, Pat [R-PA] 04/06/2011
Sen. Risch, James E. [R-ID] 04/06/2011
Sen. Moran, Jerry [R-KS] 04/06/2011
Sen. Barrasso, John [R-WY] 04/06/2011
Sen. McConnell, Mitch [R-KY] 04/06/2011
Sen. Coats, Daniel [R-IN] 04/06/2011
Sen. Hagan, Kay [D-NC] 04/06/2011
Sen. Lieberman, Joseph I. [ID-CT] 04/07/2011
Sen. Udall, Tom [D-NM] 04/07/2011
Sen. Bingaman, Jeff [D-NM] 04/07/2011
Sen. Tester, Jon [D-MT] 04/07/2011
Sen. Vitter, David [R-LA] 04/07/2011
Sen. Corker, Bob [R-TN] 04/07/2011
Sen. Manchin, Joe, III [D-WV] 04/07/2011
Sen. Udall, Mark [D-CO] 04/07/2011
Sen. Rockefeller, John D., IV [D-WV] 04/07/2011
Sen. Blumenthal, Richard [D-CT] 04/07/2011
Sen. Sessions, Jeff [R-AL] 04/07/2011
Sen. Brown, Scott P. [R-MA] 04/07/2011
Sen. Klobuchar, Amy [D-MN] 04/07/2011
Sen. Alexander, Lamar [R-TN] 04/07/2011
Sen. Shelby, Richard C. [R-AL] 04/07/2011
Sen. Lugar, Richard G. [R-IN] 04/07/2011
Sen. Pryor, Mark L. [D-AR] 04/08/2011
Sen. Boozman, John [R-AR] 04/08/2011
Sen. Bennet, Michael F. [D-CO] 04/08/2011
Sen. Baucus, Max [D-MT] 04/08/2011
Sen. Isakson, Johnny [R-GA] 04/08/2011
Sen. Kirk, Mark Steven [R-IL] 04/08/2011
Sen. Johnson, Tim [D-SD] 04/08/2011
Sen. Durbin, Richard [D-IL] 04/08/2011
Sen. Warner, Mark R. [D-VA] 04/08/2011
Sen. Kerry, John F. [D-MA] 04/08/2011
Sen. Franken, Al [D-MN] 04/08/2011
Sen. Cantwell, Maria [D-WA] 04/08/2011
Sen. Feinstein, Dianne [D-CA] 04/08/2011
Sen. Wicker, Roger F. [R-MS] 04/08/2011
Sen. McCaskill, Claire [D-MO] 04/08/2011
Sen. McCain, John [R-AZ] 04/08/2011
Sen. Kohl, Herb [D-WI] 04/08/2011
Sen. Cochran, Thad [R-MS] 04/08/2011
Sen. Coons, Christopher A. [D-DE] 04/08/2011
Sen. Nelson, Bill [D-FL] 04/08/2011
Sen. Brown, Sherrod [D-OH] 04/08/2011
Sen. Conrad, Kent [D-ND] 04/08/2011
Sen. Coburn, Tom [R-OK] 04/08/2011
Sen. Leahy, Patrick J. [D-VT] 04/08/2011
Sen. Merkley, Jeff [D-OR] 04/08/2011
Sen. Boxer, Barbara [D-CA] 04/08/2011
Sen. Landrieu, Mary L. [D-LA] 04/08/2011
Sen. Paul, Rand [R-KY] 04/08/2011
Sen. Begich, Mark [D-AK] 04/08/2011
Sen. Whitehouse, Sheldon [D-RI] 04/12/2011
Sen. Heller, Dean [R-NV] 06/30/2011