Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Johanns, Mike [R-NE] 04/07/2011
Sen. Hatch, Orrin G. [R-UT] 04/12/2011
Sen. McCain, John [R-AZ] 04/12/2011
Sen. Vitter, David [R-LA] 04/12/2011
Sen. Lee, Mike [R-UT] 04/14/2011
Sen. Isakson, Johnny [R-GA] 05/02/2011
Sen. Ayotte, Kelly [R-NH] 05/18/2011
Sen. Coburn, Tom [R-OK] 05/18/2011
Sen. Johnson, Ron [R-WI] 05/18/2011
Sen. Paul, Rand [R-KY] 05/18/2011
Sen. DeMint, Jim [R-SC] 06/14/2011
Sen. Blunt, Roy [R-MO] 06/16/2011
Sen. Sessions, Jeff [R-AL] 06/16/2011
Sen. Thune, John [R-SD] 06/16/2011
Sen. Risch, James E. [R-ID] 06/16/2011
Sen. Coats, Daniel [R-IN] 06/21/2011
Sen. Cornyn, John [R-TX] 07/07/2011
Sen. Hoeven, John [R-ND] 07/20/2011