Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Crapo, Mike [R-ID]* 04/06/2011
Sen. Kirk, Mark Steven [R-IL] 04/08/2011
Sen. Boozman, John [R-AR] 05/11/2011
Sen. Ayotte, Kelly [R-NH] 05/12/2011
Sen. Isakson, Johnny [R-GA] 05/12/2011
Sen. Collins, Susan M. [R-ME] 05/17/2011
Sen. Thune, John [R-SD] 05/17/2011
Sen. Roberts, Pat [R-KS] 05/17/2011
Sen. Inhofe, James M. [R-OK] 05/23/2011
Sen. Chambliss, Saxby [R-GA] 06/09/2011
Sen. Blunt, Roy [R-MO] 12/07/2011