Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Murkowski, Lisa [R-AK]* 04/06/2011
Sen. Durbin, Richard [D-IL]* 04/06/2011
Sen. Udall, Tom [D-NM]* 04/06/2011
Sen. Begich, Mark [D-AK] 04/07/2011
Sen. Bingaman, Jeff [D-NM] 04/08/2011
Sen. Wyden, Ron [D-OR] 04/12/2011
Sen. Johnson, Tim [D-SD] 05/05/2011
Sen. Conrad, Kent [D-ND] 05/09/2011
Sen. Lautenberg, Frank R. [D-NJ] 06/06/2011
Sen. Murray, Patty [D-WA] 06/15/2011
Sen. Carper, Thomas R. [D-DE] 06/20/2011
Sen. Reid, Harry [D-NV] 06/27/2011
Sen. Coons, Christopher A. [D-DE] 09/20/2011
Sen. Klobuchar, Amy [D-MN] 02/13/2012
Sen. Sanders, Bernard [I-VT] 03/19/2012
Sen. Tester, Jon [D-MT] 05/10/2012