Refine your search

Showing 11 of 11 total for Major Actions.
Date Major Actions
11/27/2012 Became Public Law No: 112-199.
11/27/2012 Signed by President.
11/16/2012 Presented to President.
11/13/2012 Resolving differences -- Senate actions: Senate agreed to House amendment to the bill (S.743) by Unanimous Consent.(consideration: CR S6761; text as Senate agreed to House amendment: CR S6761)
09/28/2012 Passed/agreed to in House: On passage Passed without objection.
09/28/2012 Committee on Homeland Security discharged.
09/28/2012 Committee on Intelligence (Permanent) discharged.
09/28/2012 Committee on Oversight and Government discharged.
05/08/2012 Passed/agreed to in Senate: Passed Senate with amendments by Unanimous Consent.(consideration: CR S2978-2985; text as passed Senate: CR S2978-2985)
04/19/2012 Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs. Reported by Senator Lieberman with amendments. With written report No. 112-155.
04/06/2011 Introduced in Senate