Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Boxer, Barbara [D-CA]* 04/06/2011
Sen. Cardin, Benjamin L. [D-MD]* 04/06/2011
Sen. Franken, Al [D-MN]* 04/06/2011
Sen. Harkin, Tom [D-IA]* 04/06/2011
Sen. Kerry, John F. [D-MA]* 04/06/2011
Sen. Klobuchar, Amy [D-MN]* 04/06/2011
Sen. Leahy, Patrick J. [D-VT]* 04/06/2011
Sen. Merkley, Jeff [D-OR]* 04/06/2011
Sen. Mikulski, Barbara A. [D-MD]* 04/06/2011
Sen. Sanders, Bernard [I-VT]* 04/06/2011
Sen. Shaheen, Jeanne [D-NH]* 04/06/2011
Sen. Tester, Jon [D-MT]* 04/06/2011
Sen. McCaskill, Claire [D-MO] 05/23/2011
Sen. Menendez, Robert [D-NJ] 12/15/2011
Sen. Akaka, Daniel K. [D-HI] 01/30/2012
Sen. Gillibrand, Kirsten E. [D-NY] 04/26/2012