Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Isakson, Johnny [R-GA]* 04/08/2011
Sen. Leahy, Patrick J. [D-VT] 05/25/2011
Sen. Wyden, Ron [D-OR] 05/25/2011
Sen. Begich, Mark [D-AK] 05/25/2011
Sen. Pryor, Mark L. [D-AR] 06/07/2011
Sen. Hagan, Kay [D-NC] 06/21/2011
Sen. Stabenow, Debbie [D-MI] 07/06/2011
Sen. Murkowski, Lisa [R-AK] 07/07/2011