Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Akaka, Daniel K. [D-HI]* 04/12/2011
Sen. Boxer, Barbara [D-CA]* 04/12/2011
Sen. Cantwell, Maria [D-WA]* 04/12/2011
Sen. Cardin, Benjamin L. [D-MD]* 04/12/2011
Sen. Casey, Robert P., Jr. [D-PA]* 04/12/2011
Sen. Coons, Christopher A. [D-DE]* 04/12/2011
Sen. Durbin, Richard [D-IL]* 04/12/2011
Sen. Franken, Al [D-MN]* 04/12/2011
Sen. Gillibrand, Kirsten E. [D-NY]* 04/12/2011
Sen. Harkin, Tom [D-IA]* 04/12/2011
Sen. Kerry, John F. [D-MA]* 04/12/2011
Sen. Klobuchar, Amy [D-MN]* 04/12/2011
Sen. Lautenberg, Frank R. [D-NJ]* 04/12/2011
Sen. Leahy, Patrick J. [D-VT]* 04/12/2011
Sen. Levin, Carl [D-MI]* 04/12/2011
Sen. McCaskill, Claire [D-MO]* 04/12/2011
Sen. Murray, Patty [D-WA]* 04/12/2011
Sen. Reed, Jack [D-RI]* 04/12/2011
Sen. Reid, Harry [D-NV]* 04/12/2011
Sen. Shaheen, Jeanne [D-NH]* 04/12/2011
Sen. Stabenow, Debbie [D-MI]* 04/12/2011
Sen. Whitehouse, Sheldon [D-RI]* 04/12/2011
Sen. Wyden, Ron [D-OR]* 04/12/2011
Sen. Merkley, Jeff [D-OR]* 04/12/2011
Sen. Hagan, Kay [D-NC]* 04/12/2011
Sen. Blumenthal, Richard [D-CT] 04/13/2011
Sen. Brown, Sherrod [D-OH] 04/13/2011
Sen. Begich, Mark [D-AK] 05/02/2011
Sen. Inouye, Daniel K. [D-HI] 06/07/2011
Sen. Schumer, Charles E. [D-NY] 06/15/2011
Sen. Sanders, Bernard [I-VT] 06/21/2011
Sen. Feinstein, Dianne [D-CA] 07/28/2011
Sen. Udall, Tom [D-NM] 10/13/2011
Sen. Menendez, Robert [D-NJ] 12/01/2011
Sen. Landrieu, Mary L. [D-LA] 04/17/2012
Sen. Bingaman, Jeff [D-NM] 06/04/2012