Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Merkley, Jeff [D-OR]* 04/12/2011
Sen. Sanders, Bernard [I-VT]* 04/12/2011
Sen. Udall, Tom [D-NM]* 04/12/2011
Sen. Begich, Mark [D-AK]* 04/12/2011
Sen. Leahy, Patrick J. [D-VT]* 04/12/2011
Sen. Bennet, Michael F. [D-CO]* 04/12/2011
Sen. Franken, Al [D-MN]* 04/12/2011
Sen. Carper, Thomas R. [D-DE]* 04/12/2011
Sen. Cardin, Benjamin L. [D-MD]* 04/12/2011
Sen. Klobuchar, Amy [D-MN]* 04/12/2011
Sen. Wyden, Ron [D-OR]* 04/12/2011
Sen. Stabenow, Debbie [D-MI] 05/10/2011
Sen. Whitehouse, Sheldon [D-RI] 05/18/2011
Sen. Murray, Patty [D-WA] 05/26/2011
Sen. Casey, Robert P., Jr. [D-PA] 06/06/2011
Sen. Gillibrand, Kirsten E. [D-NY] 06/07/2011
Sen. Lautenberg, Frank R. [D-NJ] 06/09/2011
Sen. Nelson, Bill [D-FL] 06/21/2011
Sen. Blumenthal, Richard [D-CT] 06/29/2011
Sen. Levin, Carl [D-MI] 07/13/2011
Sen. Shaheen, Jeanne [D-NH] 09/07/2011
Sen. Akaka, Daniel K. [D-HI] 09/07/2011