Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Landrieu, Mary L. [D-LA]* 04/13/2011
Sen. Isakson, Johnny [R-GA]* 04/13/2011
Sen. Coburn, Tom [R-OK]* 04/13/2011
Sen. Burr, Richard [R-NC] 05/09/2011
Sen. Hagan, Kay [D-NC] 05/09/2011
Sen. Inhofe, James M. [R-OK] 06/29/2011
Sen. Johanns, Mike [R-NE] 06/29/2011
Sen. Lugar, Richard G. [R-IN] 07/11/2011
Sen. Risch, James E. [R-ID] 07/11/2011
Sen. Coats, Daniel [R-IN] 07/13/2011
Sen. Murkowski, Lisa [R-AK] 07/21/2011
Sen. Heller, Dean [R-NV] 02/06/2012
Sen. Moran, Jerry [R-KS] 02/27/2012
Sen. Hoeven, John [R-ND] 02/27/2012