Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Collins, Susan M. [R-ME]* 04/13/2011
Sen. Sanders, Bernard [I-VT]* 04/13/2011
Sen. Lieberman, Joseph I. [ID-CT]* 04/13/2011
Sen. Brown, Sherrod [D-OH] 06/09/2011
Sen. Akaka, Daniel K. [D-HI] 07/20/2011
Sen. Gillibrand, Kirsten E. [D-NY] 10/03/2011
Sen. Kerry, John F. [D-MA] 10/11/2011
Sen. Blumenthal, Richard [D-CT] 10/17/2011
Sen. Begich, Mark [D-AK] 11/18/2011
Sen. Merkley, Jeff [D-OR] 11/18/2011
Sen. Leahy, Patrick J. [D-VT] 12/01/2011
Sen. Udall, Tom [D-NM] 12/15/2011
Sen. Inouye, Daniel K. [D-HI] 01/26/2012
Sen. Menendez, Robert [D-NJ] 02/16/2012
Sen. Mikulski, Barbara A. [D-MD] 09/13/2012
Sen. Reed, Jack [D-RI] 09/19/2012
Sen. Durbin, Richard [D-IL] 09/20/2012