Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Kirk, Mark Steven [R-IL]* 04/13/2011
Sen. Harkin, Tom [D-IA]* 04/13/2011
Sen. Collins, Susan M. [R-ME]* 04/13/2011
Sen. Akaka, Daniel K. [D-HI] 04/14/2011
Sen. Begich, Mark [D-AK] 04/14/2011
Sen. Bennet, Michael F. [D-CO] 04/14/2011
Sen. Bingaman, Jeff [D-NM] 04/14/2011
Sen. Blumenthal, Richard [D-CT] 04/14/2011
Sen. Boxer, Barbara [D-CA] 04/14/2011
Sen. Brown, Sherrod [D-OH] 04/14/2011
Sen. Cantwell, Maria [D-WA] 04/14/2011
Sen. Cardin, Benjamin L. [D-MD] 04/14/2011
Sen. Casey, Robert P., Jr. [D-PA] 04/14/2011
Sen. Durbin, Richard [D-IL] 04/14/2011
Sen. Feinstein, Dianne [D-CA] 04/14/2011
Sen. Franken, Al [D-MN] 04/14/2011
Sen. Gillibrand, Kirsten E. [D-NY] 04/14/2011
Sen. Inouye, Daniel K. [D-HI] 04/14/2011
Sen. Kerry, John F. [D-MA] 04/14/2011
Sen. Klobuchar, Amy [D-MN] 04/14/2011
Sen. Lautenberg, Frank R. [D-NJ] 04/14/2011
Sen. Leahy, Patrick J. [D-VT] 04/14/2011
Sen. Levin, Carl [D-MI] 04/14/2011
Sen. Lieberman, Joseph I. [ID-CT] 04/14/2011
Sen. Mikulski, Barbara A. [D-MD] 04/14/2011
Sen. Murray, Patty [D-WA] 04/14/2011
Sen. Reed, Jack [D-RI] 04/14/2011
Sen. Sanders, Bernard [I-VT] 04/14/2011
Sen. Schumer, Charles E. [D-NY] 04/14/2011
Sen. Shaheen, Jeanne [D-NH] 04/14/2011
Sen. Snowe, Olympia J. [R-ME] 04/14/2011
Sen. Stabenow, Debbie [D-MI] 04/14/2011
Sen. Udall, Mark [D-CO] 04/14/2011
Sen. Udall, Tom [D-NM] 04/14/2011
Sen. Webb, Jim [D-VA] 04/14/2011
Sen. Whitehouse, Sheldon [D-RI] 04/14/2011
Sen. Wyden, Ron [D-OR] 04/14/2011
Sen. Menendez, Robert [D-NJ] 04/14/2011
Sen. Coons, Christopher A. [D-DE] 04/14/2011
Sen. McCaskill, Claire [D-MO] 07/29/2011
Sen. Hagan, Kay [D-NC] 09/26/2011
Sen. Carper, Thomas R. [D-DE] 06/20/2012
Sen. Warner, Mark R. [D-VA] 09/19/2012