There is one summary for this bill. Bill summaries are authored by CRS.

Shown Here:
Introduced in Senate (04/14/2011)

September 11 Family Humanitarian Relief and Patriotism Act of 2011 - Provides permanent resident status adjustment for an applicant alien who: (1) was on September 10, 2001, the spouse, child, or unmarried son or daughter of an alien who died as a direct result of the September 11, 2001, terrorist activity against the United States; (2) was deemed to be a beneficiary of, and by, the September 11th Victim Compensation Fund of 2001; (3) has no federal tax liability; (4) made a proffer of information to the Secretary of Homeland Security (DHS) between April 24, 2008, and August 15, 2008, in connection with a request for immigration relief; and (5) applies not later than one year from the date of enactment of this Act.

Makes the provisions of this Act inapplicable to an alien who is inadmissible or deportable under criminal or security grounds, including September 11, 2001, terrorist activity.