Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Murray, Patty [D-WA]* 04/14/2011
Sen. Snowe, Olympia J. [R-ME] 06/09/2011
Sen. Durbin, Richard [D-IL] 06/14/2011
Sen. Klobuchar, Amy [D-MN] 06/21/2011
Sen. Stabenow, Debbie [D-MI] 06/23/2011
Sen. Tester, Jon [D-MT] 06/27/2011
Sen. Coons, Christopher A. [D-DE] 07/07/2011
Sen. Gillibrand, Kirsten E. [D-NY] 07/20/2011
Sen. Menendez, Robert [D-NJ] 07/22/2011
Sen. Mikulski, Barbara A. [D-MD] 07/25/2011
Sen. Boxer, Barbara [D-CA] 07/25/2011
Sen. Blumenthal, Richard [D-CT] 07/25/2011
Sen. Begich, Mark [D-AK] 08/01/2011
Sen. Sanders, Bernard [I-VT] 08/02/2011
Sen. Akaka, Daniel K. [D-HI] 10/03/2011
Sen. Lautenberg, Frank R. [D-NJ] 11/29/2011
Sen. Bennet, Michael F. [D-CO] 11/30/2011
Sen. Udall, Mark [D-CO] 12/01/2011
Sen. Merkley, Jeff [D-OR] 12/01/2011
Sen. Reed, Jack [D-RI] 12/01/2011
Sen. Brown, Sherrod [D-OH] 12/05/2011