Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Thune, John [R-SD]* 04/14/2011
Sen. Nelson, Ben [D-NE]* 04/14/2011
Sen. Begich, Mark [D-AK]* 04/14/2011
Sen. Boozman, John [R-AR]* 04/14/2011
Sen. Vitter, David [R-LA] 05/03/2011
Sen. Klobuchar, Amy [D-MN] 05/04/2011
Sen. Murkowski, Lisa [R-AK] 05/09/2011
Sen. Moran, Jerry [R-KS] 05/12/2011
Sen. Johanns, Mike [R-NE] 05/16/2011
Sen. Crapo, Mike [R-ID] 05/18/2011
Sen. Inhofe, James M. [R-OK] 05/19/2011
Sen. Rubio, Marco [R-FL] 05/24/2011
Sen. Hagan, Kay R. [D-NC] 06/23/2011
Sen. Cochran, Thad [R-MS] 06/23/2011
Sen. Burr, Richard [R-NC] 06/27/2011
Sen. Wicker, Roger F. [R-MS] 07/13/2011
Sen. Hatch, Orrin G. [R-UT] 07/20/2011
Sen. Risch, James E. [R-ID] 07/20/2011
Sen. McCaskill, Claire [D-MO] 07/22/2011
Sen. Blunt, Roy [R-MO] 08/02/2011
Sen. Sessions, Jeff [R-AL] 09/06/2011
Sen. Heller, Dean [R-NV] 09/22/2011
Sen. Graham, Lindsey [R-SC] 09/26/2011
Sen. Alexander, Lamar [R-TN] 10/04/2011
Sen. Roberts, Pat [R-KS] 10/11/2011
Sen. Chambliss, Saxby [R-GA] 11/01/2011
Sen. Cornyn, John [R-TX] 11/18/2011