Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Hutchison, Kay Bailey [R-TX]* 04/14/2011
Sen. Casey, Robert P., Jr. [D-PA]* 04/14/2011
Sen. Snowe, Olympia J. [R-ME] 05/04/2011
Sen. Tester, Jon [D-MT] 05/17/2011
Sen. Franken, Al [D-MN] 05/17/2011
Sen. Graham, Lindsey [R-SC] 05/17/2011
Sen. McCaskill, Claire [D-MO] 05/24/2011
Sen. Sessions, Jeff [R-AL] 05/24/2011
Sen. Klobuchar, Amy [D-MN] 05/25/2011
Sen. Cantwell, Maria [D-WA] 06/08/2011
Sen. Whitehouse, Sheldon [D-RI] 06/15/2011