Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Graham, Lindsey [R-SC]* 05/02/2011
Sen. Leahy, Patrick J. [D-VT]* 05/02/2011
Sen. Snowe, Olympia J. [R-ME]* 05/02/2011
Sen. Blumenthal, Richard [D-CT]* 05/02/2011
Sen. Wicker, Roger F. [R-MS]* 05/02/2011
Sen. Begich, Mark [D-AK]* 05/02/2011
Sen. Chambliss, Saxby [R-GA]* 05/02/2011
Sen. Gillibrand, Kirsten E. [D-NY] 05/19/2011
Sen. Johnson, Tim [D-SD] 05/23/2011
Sen. Coons, Christopher A. [D-DE] 05/23/2011
Sen. Bingaman, Jeff [D-NM] 05/24/2011
Sen. Whitehouse, Sheldon [D-RI] 05/25/2011
Sen. Wyden, Ron [D-OR] 06/06/2011
Sen. Hagan, Kay [D-NC] 06/06/2011
Sen. Klobuchar, Amy [D-MN] 06/06/2011
Sen. Roberts, Pat [R-KS] 06/07/2011
Sen. Blunt, Roy [R-MO] 06/20/2011
Sen. Rockefeller, John D., IV [D-WV] 07/19/2011
Sen. Baucus, Max [D-MT] 07/19/2011
Sen. Sanders, Bernard [I-VT] 07/19/2011
Sen. Thune, John [R-SD] 07/26/2011
Sen. Moran, Jerry [R-KS] 07/27/2011
Sen. Nelson, Bill [D-FL] 07/27/2011
Sen. Boxer, Barbara [D-CA] 08/02/2011
Sen. Shaheen, Jeanne [D-NH] 08/02/2011
Sen. Menendez, Robert [D-NJ] 09/06/2011
Sen. Warner, Mark R. [D-VA] 09/06/2011
Sen. Casey, Robert P., Jr. [D-PA] 09/12/2011
Sen. Murkowski, Lisa [R-AK] 06/12/2012
Sen. Mikulski, Barbara A. [D-MD] 06/14/2012
Sen. Lautenberg, Frank R. [D-NJ] 06/14/2012
Sen. Schumer, Charles E. [D-NY] 06/18/2012
Sen. Landrieu, Mary L. [D-LA] 06/20/2012
Sen. Heller, Dean [R-NV] 06/21/2012
Sen. McCaskill, Claire [D-MO] 07/23/2012