Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Alexander, Lamar [R-TN]* 05/03/2011
Sen. Barrasso, John [R-WY]* 05/03/2011
Sen. Burr, Richard [R-NC]* 05/03/2011
Sen. Coburn, Tom [R-OK]* 05/03/2011
Sen. Cornyn, John [R-TX]* 05/03/2011
Sen. Johanns, Mike [R-NE]* 05/03/2011
Sen. Kyl, Jon [R-AZ]* 05/03/2011
Sen. Risch, James E. [R-ID] 05/04/2011
Sen. Thune, John [R-SD] 05/04/2011
Sen. Shelby, Richard C. [R-AL] 05/04/2011
Sen. Paul, Rand [R-KY] 05/04/2011
Sen. Johnson, Ron [R-WI] 05/04/2011
Sen. Grassley, Chuck [R-IA] 05/04/2011
Sen. Lee, Mike [R-UT] 05/04/2011
Sen. McCain, John [R-AZ] 05/04/2011
Sen. Coats, Daniel [R-IN] 05/04/2011
Sen. Sessions, Jeff [R-AL] 05/05/2011
Sen. Inhofe, James M. [R-OK] 05/09/2011
Sen. Blunt, Roy [R-MO] 05/10/2011
Sen. Chambliss, Saxby [R-GA] 05/10/2011
Sen. Hoeven, John [R-ND] 05/10/2011
Sen. Corker, Bob [R-TN] 05/26/2011
Sen. Roberts, Pat [R-KS] 06/06/2011
Sen. Boozman, John [R-AR] 06/07/2011
Sen. Cochran, Thad [R-MS] 06/27/2011