Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Wicker, Roger F. [R-MS]* 05/04/2011
Sen. Blunt, Roy [R-MO]* 05/04/2011
Sen. Boozman, John [R-AR] 05/23/2011
Sen. Burr, Richard [R-NC] 12/01/2011
Sen. Conrad, Kent [D-ND] 02/07/2012
Sen. Thune, John [R-SD] 03/08/2012
Sen. Vitter, David [R-LA] 04/18/2012
Sen. Isakson, Johnny [R-GA] 04/19/2012
Sen. Hutchison, Kay Bailey [R-TX] 04/19/2012
Sen. Chambliss, Saxby [R-GA] 04/23/2012
Sen. Nelson, Ben [D-NE] 05/10/2012
Sen. Tester, Jon [D-MT] 05/10/2012
Sen. Johanns, Mike [R-NE] 05/24/2012
Sen. Baucus, Max [D-MT] 06/20/2012
Sen. Moran, Jerry [R-KS] 07/24/2012
Sen. Roberts, Pat [R-KS] 07/25/2012