There are 5 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (6)

Short Titles

Short Titles as Enacted

Veterans' Compensation Cost-of-Living Adjustment Act of 2011

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Passed House

Veterans' Compensation Cost-of-Living Adjustment Act of 2011

Short Titles - Senate

Short Titles as Passed Senate

Veterans' Compensation Cost-of-Living Adjustment Act of 2011

Short Titles as Reported to Senate

Veterans' Compensation Cost-of-Living Adjustment Act of 2011

Short Titles as Introduced

Veterans' Compensation Cost-of-Living Adjustment Act of 2011

Official Titles

Official Titles - Senate

Official Titles as Introduced

A bill to amend title 38, United States Code, to provide for an increase, effective December 1, 2011, in the rates of compensation for veterans with service-connected disabilities and the rates of dependency and indemnity compensation for the survivors of certain disabled veterans, and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (7)

Date
11/09/2011Became Public Law No: 112-53. (TXT | PDF)
11/09/2011Signed by President.
11/03/2011Presented to President.
11/02/2011Passed/agreed to in House: On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by voice vote.(text: CR H7232-7233)
10/19/2011Passed/agreed to in Senate: Passed Senate without amendment by Unanimous Consent.(consideration: CR S6787; text as passed Senate: CR S6787)
08/01/2011Committee on Veterans' Affairs. Reported by Senator Murray without amendment. With written report No. 112-44.
05/05/2011Introduced in Senate

All Actions (18)

Date Chamber
11/09/2011Became Public Law No: 112-53. (TXT | PDF)
11/09/2011Signed by President.
11/03/2011SenatePresented to President.
11/02/2011-1:52pmHouseOn motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H7232-7233)
11/02/2011-1:52pmHouseMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
11/02/2011-1:39pmHouseDEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on S. 894.
11/02/2011-1:39pmHouseConsidered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H7232-7234)
11/02/2011-1:39pmHouseMr. Miller (FL) moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill.
10/21/2011-1:41pmHouseHeld at the desk.
10/21/2011-10:05amHouseReceived in the House.
10/20/2011SenateMessage on Senate action sent to the House.
10/19/2011SenatePassed Senate without amendment by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S6787; text as passed Senate: CR S6787)
08/01/2011SenatePlaced on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 125.
08/01/2011SenateCommittee on Veterans' Affairs. Reported by Senator Murray without amendment. With written report No. 112-44.
06/29/2011SenateCommittee on Veterans' Affairs. Ordered to be reported without amendment favorably.
06/08/2011SenateCommittee on Veterans' Affairs. Hearings held.
05/05/2011SenateRead twice and referred to the Committee on Veterans' Affairs. (text of measure as introduced: CR S2736-2737)
05/05/2011SenateSponsor introductory remarks on measure. (CR S2736)

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
Senate Veterans' Affairs05/05/2011 Referred to
06/08/2011 Hearings by
06/29/2011 Markup by
08/01/2011 Reported by S. Rept. 112-44

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Subjects (4)


Latest Summary (5)

There are 5 summaries for S.894. View summaries

Shown Here:
Public Law No: 112-53 (11/09/2011)

(This measure has not been amended since it was introduced. The summary of that version is repeated here.)

Veterans' Compensation Cost-of-Living Adjustment Act of 2011 - Directs the Secretary of Veterans Affairs (VA) to increase, as of December 1, 2011, the rates of veterans' disability compensation, additional compensation for dependents, the clothing allowance for certain disabled veterans, and dependency and indemnity compensation for surviving spouses and children.

Requires each such increase to be the same percentage as the increase in benefits provided under title II (Old Age, Survivors and Disability Insurance) of the Social Security Act, on the same effective date.