Text: S.894 — 112th Congress (2011-2012)All Information (Except Text)

Text available as:

Shown Here:
Public Law No: 112-53 (11/09/2011)

 
[112th Congress Public Law 53]
[From the U.S. Government Printing Office]



[[Page 125 STAT. 548]]

Public Law 112-53
112th Congress

                                 An Act


 
   To amend title 38, United States Code, to provide for an increase, 
 effective December 1, 2011, in the rates of compensation for veterans 
  with service-connected disabilities and the rates of dependency and 
 indemnity compensation for the survivors of certain disabled veterans, 
       and for other purposes. <<NOTE: Nov. 9, 2011 -  [S. 894]>> 

    Be it enacted by the Senate and House of Representatives of the 
United States of America in Congress assembled, <<NOTE: Veterans' 
Compensation Cost-of-Living Adjustment Act of 2011.>> 
SECTION 1. <<NOTE: 38 USC 101 note.>> SHORT TITLE.

    This Act may be cited as the ``Veterans' Compensation Cost-of-Living 
Adjustment Act of 2011''.
SEC. 2. <<NOTE: 38 USC 1114 note.>> INCREASE IN RATES OF 
                    DISABILITY COMPENSATION AND DEPENDENCY AND 
                    INDEMNITY COMPENSATION.

    (a) Rate Adjustment.--Effective on December 1, 2011, the Secretary 
of Veterans Affairs shall increase, in accordance with subsection (c), 
the dollar amounts in effect on November 30, 2011, for the payment of 
disability compensation and dependency and indemnity compensation under 
the provisions specified in subsection (b).
    (b) Amounts To Be Increased.--The dollar amounts to be increased 
pursuant to subsection (a) are the following:
            (1) Wartime disability compensation.--Each of the dollar 
        amounts under section 1114 of title 38, United States Code.
            (2) Additional compensation for dependents.--Each of the 
        dollar amounts under section 1115(1) of such title.
            (3) Clothing allowance.--The dollar amount under section 
        1162 of such title.
            (4) Dependency and indemnity compensation to surviving 
        spouse.--Each of the dollar amounts under subsections (a) 
        through (d) of section 1311 of such title.
            (5) Dependency and indemnity compensation to children.--Each 
        of the dollar amounts under sections 1313(a) and 1314 of such 
        title.

    (c) Determination of Increase.--
            (1) Percentage.--Except as provided in paragraph (2), each 
        dollar amount described in subsection (b) shall be increased by 
        the same percentage as the percentage by which benefit amounts 
        payable under title II of the Social Security Act (42 U.S.C. 401 
        et seq.) are increased effective December 1, 2011, as a result 
        of a determination under section 215(i) of such Act (42 U.S.C. 
        415(i)).
            (2) Rounding.--Each dollar amount increased under paragraph 
        (1), if not a whole dollar amount, shall be rounded to the next 
        lower whole dollar amount.

[[Page 125 STAT. 549]]

    (d) Special Rule.--The Secretary of Veterans Affairs may adjust 
administratively, consistent with the increases made under subsection 
(a), the rates of disability compensation payable to persons under 
section 10 of Public Law 85-857 (72 Stat. 1263) who have not received 
compensation under chapter 11 of title 38, United States Code.
    (e) <<NOTE: Federal Register, publication. Deadline.>>  Publication 
of Adjusted Rates.--The Secretary of Veterans Affairs shall publish in 
the Federal Register the amounts specified in subsection (b), as 
increased under subsection (a), not later than the date on which the 
matters specified in section 215(i)(2)(D) of the Social Security Act (42 
U.S.C. 415(i)(2)(D)) are required to be published by reason of a 
determination made under section 215(i) of such Act during fiscal year 
2012.

    Approved November 9, 2011.

LEGISLATIVE HISTORY--S. 894 (H.R. 1407):
---------------------------------------------------------------------------

HOUSE REPORTS: No. 112-82 (Comm. on Veterans' Affairs) accompanying 
H.R. 1407.
SENATE REPORTS: No. 112-44 (Comm. on Veterans' Affairs).
CONGRESSIONAL RECORD, Vol. 157 (2011):
            Oct. 19, considered and passed Senate.
            Nov. 2, considered and passed House.

                                  <all>