Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Shelby, Richard C. [R-AL]* 05/05/2011
Sen. Blunt, Roy [R-MO]* 05/05/2011
Sen. DeMint, Jim [R-SC]* 05/05/2011
Sen. Coats, Daniel [R-IN]* 05/05/2011
Sen. Burr, Richard [R-NC]* 05/05/2011
Sen. Enzi, Michael B. [R-WY]* 05/05/2011
Sen. Coburn, Tom [R-OK]* 05/05/2011
Sen. Vitter, David [R-LA]* 05/05/2011
Sen. Risch, James E. [R-ID]* 05/05/2011
Sen. Barrasso, John [R-WY]* 05/05/2011
Sen. Cochran, Thad [R-MS]* 05/05/2011
Sen. Boozman, John [R-AR]* 05/05/2011
Sen. Moran, Jerry [R-KS]* 05/05/2011
Sen. Ayotte, Kelly [R-NH]* 05/05/2011
Sen. Johanns, Mike [R-NE]* 05/05/2011
Sen. Grassley, Chuck [R-IA]* 05/05/2011
Sen. Paul, Rand [R-KY]* 05/05/2011
Sen. Rubio, Marco [R-FL]* 05/05/2011
Sen. Inhofe, James M. [R-OK]* 05/05/2011
Sen. Hatch, Orrin G. [R-UT]* 05/05/2011
Sen. Kyl, Jon [R-AZ]* 05/05/2011
Sen. Thune, John [R-SD]* 05/05/2011
Sen. Lugar, Richard G. [R-IN] 05/10/2011
Sen. Chambliss, Saxby [R-GA] 05/10/2011
Sen. Roberts, Pat [R-KS] 05/11/2011
Sen. Graham, Lindsey [R-SC] 05/11/2011
Sen. Hoeven, John [R-ND] 05/12/2011
Sen. Lee, Mike [R-UT] 05/16/2011
Sen. Crapo, Mike [R-ID] 05/18/2011
Sen. Sessions, Jeff [R-AL] 05/23/2011
Sen. McConnell, Mitch [R-KY] 05/26/2011
Sen. Corker, Bob [R-TN] 06/06/2011
Sen. Toomey, Pat [R-PA] 06/06/2011
Sen. Portman, Rob [R-OH] 06/14/2011
Sen. Cornyn, John [R-TX] 06/16/2011
Sen. Johnson, Ron [R-WI] 07/13/2011