Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Inhofe, James M. [R-OK]* 01/25/2011
Sen. Enzi, Michael B. [R-WY]* 01/25/2011
Sen. Burr, Richard [R-NC]* 01/25/2011
Sen. Vitter, David [R-LA]* 01/25/2011
Sen. Coburn, Tom [R-OK]* 01/25/2011
Sen. Thune, John [R-SD]* 01/25/2011
Sen. Risch, James E. [R-ID]* 01/25/2011
Sen. Coats, Daniel [R-IN]* 01/25/2011
Sen. Blunt, Roy [R-MO]* 01/25/2011
Sen. Moran, Jerry [R-KS]* 01/25/2011
Sen. Boozman, John [R-AR]* 01/25/2011
Sen. Paul, Rand [R-KY]* 01/25/2011
Sen. Johanns, Mike [R-NE] 02/10/2011
Sen. Barrasso, John [R-WY] 02/10/2011
Sen. Alexander, Lamar [R-TN] 02/15/2011
Sen. Johnson, Ron [R-WI] 11/03/2011
Sen. Grassley, Chuck [R-IA] 02/13/2012
Sen. DeMint, Jim [R-SC] 02/28/2012
Sen. Hoeven, John [R-ND] 04/19/2012