Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Sanders, Bernard [I-VT] 06/07/2011
Sen. Merkley, Jeff [D-OR] 06/16/2011
Sen. Franken, Al [D-MN] 06/22/2011
Sen. Lautenberg, Frank R. [D-NJ] 06/30/2011
Sen. Wyden, Ron [D-OR] 07/12/2011
Sen. Casey, Robert P., Jr. [D-PA] 09/06/2011
Sen. Brown, Sherrod [D-OH] 11/10/2011
Sen. Schumer, Charles E. [D-NY] 03/08/2012