Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Rockefeller, John D., IV [D-WV]* 05/11/2011
Sen. Begich, Mark [D-AK]* 05/11/2011
Sen. Leahy, Patrick J. [D-VT]* 05/11/2011
Sen. Sanders, Bernard [I-VT]* 05/11/2011
Sen. Johnson, Tim [D-SD]* 05/11/2011
Sen. Bennet, Michael F. [D-CO]* 05/11/2011
Sen. Udall, Mark [D-CO]* 05/11/2011
Sen. Franken, Al [D-MN]* 05/11/2011
Sen. Conrad, Kent [D-ND]* 05/11/2011
Sen. Tester, Jon [D-MT] 05/16/2011
Sen. Udall, Tom [D-NM] 05/18/2011
Sen. Klobuchar, Amy [D-MN] 05/23/2011
Sen. Mikulski, Barbara A. [D-MD] 05/25/2011
Sen. Brown, Sherrod [D-OH] 06/07/2011
Sen. Hagan, Kay [D-NC] 06/21/2011
Sen. Stabenow, Debbie [D-MI] 06/21/2011
Sen. Manchin, Joe, III [D-WV] 07/19/2011