Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Snowe, Olympia J. [R-ME]* 05/11/2011
Sen. Reed, Jack [D-RI]* 05/11/2011
Sen. Burr, Richard [R-NC]* 05/11/2011
Sen. Sanders, Bernard [I-VT]* 05/11/2011
Sen. Gillibrand, Kirsten E. [D-NY] 05/19/2011
Sen. Collins, Susan M. [R-ME] 05/24/2011
Sen. Brown, Scott P. [R-MA] 06/06/2011
Sen. Whitehouse, Sheldon [D-RI] 06/07/2011
Sen. Kerry, John F. [D-MA] 06/07/2011
Sen. Blumenthal, Richard [D-CT] 06/14/2011
Sen. Stabenow, Debbie [D-MI] 06/16/2011
Sen. Lieberman, Joseph I. [ID-CT] 06/22/2011
Sen. Schumer, Charles E. [D-NY] 06/30/2011
Sen. Coons, Christopher A. [D-DE] 10/04/2011