Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Murkowski, Lisa [R-AK]* 05/11/2011
Sen. Rockefeller, John D., IV [D-WV]* 05/11/2011
Sen. Akaka, Daniel K. [D-HI]* 05/11/2011
Sen. Baucus, Max [D-MT]* 05/11/2011
Sen. Begich, Mark [D-AK]* 05/11/2011
Sen. Boxer, Barbara [D-CA]* 05/11/2011
Sen. Brown, Sherrod [D-OH]* 05/11/2011
Sen. Casey, Robert P., Jr. [D-PA]* 05/11/2011
Sen. Coons, Christopher A. [D-DE]* 05/11/2011
Sen. Sanders, Bernard [I-VT]* 05/11/2011
Sen. Tester, Jon [D-MT]* 05/11/2011
Sen. Leahy, Patrick J. [D-VT]* 05/11/2011
Sen. Brown, Scott P. [R-MA]* 05/11/2011
Sen. Cardin, Benjamin L. [D-MD] 05/12/2011
Sen. Whitehouse, Sheldon [D-RI] 05/16/2011
Sen. Schumer, Charles E. [D-NY] 05/17/2011
Sen. Reed, Jack [D-RI] 05/17/2011
Sen. McCaskill, Claire [D-MO] 05/26/2011
Sen. Durbin, Richard [D-IL] 06/06/2011
Sen. Bennet, Michael F. [D-CO] 06/09/2011
Sen. Snowe, Olympia J. [R-ME] 06/09/2011
Sen. Kerry, John F. [D-MA] 06/20/2011
Sen. Levin, Carl [D-MI] 06/20/2011
Sen. Stabenow, Debbie [D-MI] 06/21/2011
Sen. Udall, Tom [D-NM] 06/22/2011
Sen. Menendez, Robert [D-NJ] 06/27/2011
Sen. Kohl, Herb [D-WI] 07/07/2011
Sen. Klobuchar, Amy [D-MN] 07/11/2011
Sen. Gillibrand, Kirsten E. [D-NY] 07/26/2011
Sen. Nelson, Bill [D-FL] 07/27/2011
Sen. Nelson, Ben [D-NE] 08/02/2011
Sen. Lautenberg, Frank R. [D-NJ] 08/02/2011
Sen. Hagan, Kay R. [D-NC] 09/06/2011
Sen. Shaheen, Jeanne [D-NH] 09/26/2011
Sen. Johnson, Tim [D-SD] 10/03/2011
Sen. Blumenthal, Richard [D-CT] 10/06/2011
Sen. Cantwell, Maria [D-WA] 11/07/2011
Sen. Pryor, Mark L. [D-AR] 11/07/2011
Sen. Franken, Al [D-MN] 11/07/2011
Sen. Landrieu, Mary L. [D-LA] 11/08/2011