Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Snowe, Olympia J. [R-ME]* 05/12/2011
Sen. Reed, Jack [D-RI]* 05/12/2011
Sen. Durbin, Richard [D-IL]* 05/12/2011
Sen. Blumenthal, Richard [D-CT]* 05/12/2011
Sen. Inouye, Daniel K. [D-HI]* 05/12/2011
Sen. Shaheen, Jeanne [D-NH]* 05/12/2011
Sen. Sanders, Bernard [I-VT]* 05/12/2011
Sen. Whitehouse, Sheldon [D-RI]* 05/12/2011
Sen. Wyden, Ron [D-OR]* 05/12/2011
Sen. Akaka, Daniel K. [D-HI]* 05/12/2011
Sen. Levin, Carl [D-MI] 05/16/2011
Sen. McCaskill, Claire [D-MO] 06/07/2011
Sen. Franken, Al [D-MN] 06/07/2011
Sen. Webb, Jim [D-VA] 09/14/2011
Sen. Klobuchar, Amy [D-MN] 02/13/2012
Sen. Lautenberg, Frank R. [D-NJ] 02/13/2012
Sen. Menendez, Robert [D-NJ] 04/17/2012