Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Grassley, Chuck [R-IA]* 05/12/2011
Sen. Graham, Lindsey [R-SC]* 05/12/2011
Sen. Alexander, Lamar [R-TN] 05/25/2011
Sen. Corker, Bob [R-TN] 06/09/2011
Sen. Cochran, Thad [R-MS] 06/23/2011
Sen. McCain, John [R-AZ] 07/26/2011
Sen. Enzi, Michael B. [R-WY] 09/07/2011
Sen. Isakson, Johnny [R-GA] 11/02/2011

Show cosponsors who withdrew