Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Lieberman, Joseph I. [ID-CT]* 05/12/2011
Sen. Whitehouse, Sheldon [D-RI]* 05/12/2011
Sen. Cardin, Benjamin L. [D-MD]* 05/12/2011
Sen. Reed, Jack [D-RI]* 05/12/2011
Sen. Boxer, Barbara [D-CA] 05/18/2011
Sen. Bennet, Michael F. [D-CO] 05/19/2011
Sen. Sanders, Bernard [I-VT] 06/07/2011
Sen. Udall, Mark [D-CO] 06/07/2011
Sen. Harkin, Tom [D-IA] 06/09/2011
Sen. Stabenow, Debbie [D-MI] 06/28/2011
Sen. Menendez, Robert [D-NJ] 07/18/2011
Sen. Merkley, Jeff [D-OR] 07/25/2011
Sen. Kerry, John F. [D-MA] 12/12/2011
Sen. Kirk, Mark Steven [R-IL] 12/12/2011