Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Graham, Lindsey [R-SC]* 05/12/2011
Sen. Lieberman, Joseph I. [ID-CT]* 05/12/2011
Sen. Chambliss, Saxby [R-GA]* 05/12/2011
Sen. Brown, Scott P. [R-MA]* 05/12/2011
Sen. Rubio, Marco [R-FL]* 05/12/2011
Sen. Webb, Jim [D-VA]* 05/12/2011
Sen. Cornyn, John [R-TX] 05/16/2011
Sen. Hatch, Orrin G. [R-UT] 05/16/2011
Sen. Roberts, Pat [R-KS] 05/17/2011
Sen. Johanns, Mike [R-NE] 05/17/2011
Sen. Hutchison, Kay Bailey [R-TX] 05/17/2011
Sen. Risch, James E. [R-ID] 05/19/2011
Sen. Coats, Daniel [R-IN] 05/24/2011
Sen. Burr, Richard [R-NC] 05/24/2011
Sen. Hoeven, John [R-ND] 06/14/2011