Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Blumenthal, Richard [D-CT]* 05/12/2011
Sen. Leahy, Patrick J. [D-VT]* 05/12/2011
Sen. Durbin, Richard [D-IL]* 05/12/2011
Sen. Whitehouse, Sheldon [D-RI]* 05/12/2011
Sen. Brown, Sherrod [D-OH]* 05/12/2011
Sen. Harkin, Tom [D-IA]* 05/12/2011
Sen. Kerry, John F. [D-MA]* 05/12/2011
Sen. Merkley, Jeff [D-OR]* 05/12/2011
Sen. Udall, Tom [D-NM]* 05/12/2011
Sen. Wyden, Ron [D-OR]* 05/12/2011
Sen. Casey, Robert P., Jr. [D-PA]* 05/12/2011
Sen. Boxer, Barbara [D-CA]* 05/12/2011
Sen. Menendez, Robert [D-NJ] 07/11/2011
Sen. Mikulski, Barbara A. [D-MD] 11/30/2011
Sen. Cardin, Benjamin L. [D-MD] 01/26/2012
Sen. Cantwell, Maria [D-WA] 03/19/2012
Sen. Sanders, Bernard [I-VT] 06/21/2012