Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Harkin, Tom [D-IA]* 05/12/2011
Sen. Durbin, Richard [D-IL]* 05/12/2011
Sen. Isakson, Johnny [R-GA] 05/26/2011
Sen. Brown, Scott P. [R-MA] 10/20/2011
Sen. Inouye, Daniel K. [D-HI] 11/09/2011
Sen. Chambliss, Saxby [R-GA] 11/09/2011
Sen. Murray, Patty [D-WA] 02/29/2012
Sen. Hagan, Kay [D-NC] 03/05/2012
Sen. Blumenthal, Richard [D-CT] 09/10/2012
Sen. Conrad, Kent [D-ND] 09/13/2012
Sen. Stabenow, Debbie [D-MI] 09/20/2012
Sen. Burr, Richard [R-NC] 09/20/2012
Sen. Merkley, Jeff [D-OR] 11/26/2012
Sen. Mikulski, Barbara A. [D-MD] 11/30/2012
Sen. Casey, Robert P., Jr. [D-PA] 12/19/2012
Sen. Cardin, Benjamin L. [D-MD] 12/20/2012