Bill summaries are authored by CRS.

Shown Here:
Passed House without amendment (01/05/2011)

(This measure has not been amended since it was introduced. The summary of that version is repeated here.)

Declares that when the Senate adjourns or recesses on any day from Wednesday, January 5, 2011, through Monday, January 10, 2011, it stand adjourned or recessed until 10 a.m. on Tuesday, January 25, 2011.

Declares that: (1) when the House adjourns on the legislative day of Wednesday, January 12, 2011, it stand adjourned until 2 p.m. on Tuesday, January 18, 2011, and (2) when it adjourns on any legislative day from Wednesday, January 26, 2011, through Friday, January 28, 2011, it stand adjourned until 2 p.m. on Tuesday, February 8, 2011.