There are 3 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (1)

Official Titles

Official Titles - Senate

Official Titles as Introduced

A concurrent resolution honoring the service of Sergeant First Class Leroy Arthur Petry, a native of Santa Fe, New Mexico, and the second living recipient of the Medal of Honor since the Vietnam War.


Actions Overview (3)

Date
09/23/2011Passed/agreed to in Senate: Resolution agreed to in Senate without amendment and with a preamble by Unanimous Consent.(text: CR S5932)
09/23/2011Senate Committee on Armed Services discharged by Unanimous Consent.(consideration: CR S5932)
08/01/2011Introduced in Senate

All Actions (8)

Date Chamber
10/25/2011HouseReferred to the Subcommittee on Military Personnel.
Action By: Committee on Armed Services
09/26/2011HouseReferred to the House Committee on Armed Services.
09/26/2011-12:02pmHouseReceived in the House.
09/23/2011SenateMessage on Senate action sent to the House.
09/23/2011SenateResolution agreed to in Senate without amendment and with a preamble by Unanimous Consent. (text: CR S5932)
09/23/2011SenateSenate Committee on Armed Services discharged by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S5932)
08/01/2011SenateRead twice and referred to the Committee on Armed Services. (text of measure as introduced: CR S5197)
08/01/2011SenateSponsor introductory remarks on measure. (CR S5197)

Cosponsors (2)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Bingaman, Jeff [D-NM]* 08/01/2011
Sen. Begich, Mark [D-AK] 09/22/2011

Committees (2)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
Senate Armed Services08/01/2011 Referred to
09/23/2011 Discharged from
House Armed Services09/26/2011 Referred to
House Armed Services Subcommittee on Military Personnel10/25/2011 Referred to

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Subjects (6)


Latest Summary (2)

There are 2 summaries for S.Con.Res.27. View summaries

Shown Here:
Passed Senate without amendment (09/23/2011)

(This measure has not been amended since it was introduced. The summary of that version is repeated here.)

Honors the service and sacrifice of Sergeant First Class Leroy Arthur Petry of the U.S. Army (a native of Santa Fe, New Mexico, and the second living recipient of the Medal of Honor since the Vietnam War) and his family.

Encourages the people of the United States to recognize the valor, heroism, and dedication to the United States exhibited by Sergeant First Class Petry.