Summary: S.Con.Res.38 — 112th Congress (2011-2012)All Information (Except Text)

Bill summaries are authored by CRS.

Shown Here:
Passed House without amendment (03/30/2012)

(This measure has not been amended since it was introduced. The summary of that version is repeated here.)

Declares that when the Senate recesses or adjourns on any day from Thursday, March 29, 2012, through Sunday, April 1, 2012, it stand recessed or adjourned until 12:00 noon on Monday, April 16, 2012.

Declares that when the House adjourns on any legislative day through Friday, April 13, 2012, it stand adjourned until 2 p.m. on Monday, April 16, 2012.