Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Graham, Lindsey [R-SC]* 06/12/2012
Sen. Tester, Jon [D-MT] 06/20/2012
Sen. Wyden, Ron [D-OR] 06/20/2012
Sen. Grassley, Chuck [R-IA] 06/21/2012
Sen. Brown, Sherrod [D-OH] 06/25/2012
Sen. Johnson, Tim [D-SD] 06/26/2012
Sen. Kerry, John F. [D-MA] 06/26/2012
Sen. Manchin, Joe, III [D-WV] 06/26/2012
Sen. Coons, Christopher A. [D-DE] 06/27/2012
Sen. Casey, Robert P., Jr. [D-PA] 06/29/2012
Sen. Hoeven, John [R-ND] 06/29/2012
Sen. Conrad, Kent [D-ND] 06/29/2012
Sen. Mikulski, Barbara A. [D-MD] 07/09/2012
Sen. Murkowski, Lisa [R-AK] 07/09/2012
Sen. Harkin, Tom [D-IA] 07/09/2012
Sen. Shaheen, Jeanne [D-NH] 07/09/2012
Sen. Thune, John [R-SD] 07/11/2012
Sen. Brown, Scott P. [R-MA] 07/11/2012
Sen. Menendez, Robert [D-NJ] 07/12/2012
Sen. Toomey, Pat [R-PA] 07/12/2012
Sen. Klobuchar, Amy [D-MN] 07/16/2012
Sen. Lautenberg, Frank R. [D-NJ] 07/17/2012
Sen. Sanders, Bernard [I-VT] 07/26/2012
Sen. Hutchison, Kay Bailey [R-TX] 09/10/2012