Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. McCaskill, Claire [D-MO]* 06/27/2012
Sen. McCain, John [R-AZ]* 06/27/2012
Sen. Kerry, John F. [D-MA]* 06/27/2012
Sen. DeMint, Jim [R-SC]* 06/27/2012
Sen. Nelson, Bill [D-FL]* 06/27/2012
Sen. Johanns, Mike [R-NE]* 06/27/2012
Sen. Udall, Tom [D-NM]* 06/27/2012
Sen. Ayotte, Kelly [R-NH]* 06/27/2012
Sen. Warner, Mark R. [D-VA]* 06/27/2012
Sen. Heller, Dean [R-NV]* 06/27/2012
Sen. Boozman, John [R-AR]* 06/27/2012
Sen. Casey, Robert P., Jr. [D-PA]* 06/27/2012
Sen. Coons, Christopher A. [D-DE] 06/29/2012
Sen. Blunt, Roy [R-MO] 06/29/2012
Sen. Hatch, Orrin G. [R-UT] 07/12/2012
Sen. Hutchison, Kay Bailey [R-TX] 07/12/2012
Sen. Roberts, Pat [R-KS] 07/12/2012
Sen. Wicker, Roger F. [R-MS] 07/12/2012
Sen. Alexander, Lamar [R-TN] 07/19/2012
Sen. Barrasso, John [R-WY] 07/19/2012
Sen. Isakson, Johnny [R-GA] 07/19/2012
Sen. Klobuchar, Amy [D-MN] 07/19/2012
Sen. Murkowski, Lisa [R-AK] 07/19/2012
Sen. Tester, Jon [D-MT] 07/19/2012
Sen. Vitter, David [R-LA] 07/19/2012
Sen. Moran, Jerry [R-KS] 07/25/2012
Sen. Shaheen, Jeanne [D-NH] 07/25/2012
Sen. Thune, John [R-SD] 07/25/2012
Sen. Lee, Mike [R-UT] 07/30/2012
Sen. Menendez, Robert [D-NJ] 07/30/2012
Sen. Toomey, Pat [R-PA] 07/31/2012
Sen. Risch, James E. [R-ID] 08/02/2012
Sen. Cornyn, John [R-TX] 09/10/2012
Sen. Wyden, Ron [D-OR] 09/10/2012
Sen. Blumenthal, Richard [D-CT] 09/19/2012
Sen. Brown, Scott P. [R-MA] 09/19/2012
Sen. Coburn, Tom [R-OK] 09/19/2012
Sen. Kirk, Mark Steven [R-IL] 09/19/2012
Sen. Enzi, Michael B. [R-WY] 09/20/2012
Sen. McConnell, Mitch [R-KY] 09/21/2012