There are 3 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (1)

Official Titles

Official Titles - Senate

Official Titles as Introduced

A concurrent resolution providing for a conditional adjournment or recess of the Senate and an adjournment of the House of Representatives.


Actions Overview (3)

Date Actions Overview
08/07/2012Passed/agreed to in House: On agreeing to the resolution Agreed to by voice vote.
08/02/2012Passed/agreed to in Senate: Submitted in the Senate, considered, and agreed to without amendment by Unanimous Consent.(consideration: CR S6013-6014; text as passed Senate: CR S6013-6014)
08/02/2012Introduced in Senate

All Actions (7)

Date Chamber All Actions
08/07/2012-10:04amHouseMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
08/07/2012-10:03amHouseOn agreeing to the resolution Agreed to by voice vote.
08/07/2012-10:02amHouseConsidered as privileged matter.
08/03/2012-11:37amHouseHeld at the desk.
08/03/2012-10:03amHouseReceived in the House.
08/03/2012SenateMessage on Senate action sent to the House.
08/02/2012SenateSubmitted in the Senate, considered, and agreed to without amendment by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S6013-6014; text as passed Senate: CR S6013-6014)

Cosponsors (1)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. McConnell, Mitch [R-KY]* 08/02/2012

Committees (0)

As of 08/14/2020 text has not been received for S.Con.Res.59 - A concurrent resolution providing for a conditional adjournment or recess of the Senate and an adjournment of the House of Representatives.

Bills are generally sent to the Library of Congress from GPO, the Government Publishing Office, a day or two after they are introduced on the floor of the House or Senate. Delays can occur when there are a large number of bills to prepare or when a very large bill has to be printed.


No related bill information was received for S.Con.Res.59.


Subjects (4)


Latest Summary (3)

There are 3 summaries for S.Con.Res.59. View summaries

Shown Here:
Passed House without amendment (08/07/2012)

(This measure has not been amended since it was introduced. The summary of that version is repeated here.)

Declares that when the Senate recesses or adjourns on any day from Thursday, August 2, 2012, through Tuesday, August 7, 2012, it stand recessed or adjourned until 12:00 noon on Monday, September 10, 2012.

Declares that when the House adjourns on any legislative day from Thursday, August 2, 2012, through Tuesday, August 7, 2012, it stand adjourned until 2:00 p.m. on Monday, September 10, 2012.