Bill summaries are authored by CRS.

Shown Here:
Passed House without amendment (11/16/2012)

(This measure has not been amended since it was introduced. The summary of that version is repeated here.)

Declares that when the Senate recesses or adjourns on any day from Thursday, November 15, 2012, through Friday, November 16, 2012, it stand recessed or adjourned until 12:00 noon on Monday, November 26, 2012.

Declares that when the House adjourns on any legislative day from Friday, November 16, 2012, through Friday, November 23, 2012, it stand adjourned until 2:00 p.m. on Tuesday, November 27, 2012.