There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (1)

Official Titles

Official Titles - Senate

Official Titles as Introduced

A joint resolution approving the renewal of import restrictions contained in the Burmese Freedom and Democracy Act of 2003.


Actions Overview (1)

Date
05/26/2011Introduced in Senate

All Actions (2)

Date
05/26/2011Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance. (text of measure as introduced: CR S3449)
Action By: Senate
05/26/2011Sponsor introductory remarks on measure. (CR S3449)
Action By: Senate

Cosponsors (65)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Feinstein, Dianne [D-CA]* 05/26/2011
Sen. McCain, John [R-AZ]* 05/26/2011
Sen. Durbin, Richard J. [D-IL]* 05/26/2011
Sen. Brown, Sherrod [D-OH] 06/07/2011
Sen. Harkin, Tom [D-IA] 06/07/2011
Sen. Hagan, Kay R. [D-NC] 06/07/2011
Sen. Leahy, Patrick J. [D-VT] 06/07/2011
Sen. Kyl, Jon [R-AZ] 06/07/2011
Sen. Hutchison, Kay Bailey [R-TX] 06/07/2011
Sen. Alexander, Lamar [R-TN] 06/08/2011
Sen. Snowe, Olympia J. [R-ME] 06/09/2011
Sen. Cochran, Thad [R-MS] 06/09/2011
Sen. Menendez, Robert [D-NJ] 06/09/2011
Sen. Cardin, Benjamin L. [D-MD] 06/13/2011
Sen. Boxer, Barbara [D-CA] 06/15/2011
Sen. Klobuchar, Amy [D-MN] 06/15/2011
Sen. Whitehouse, Sheldon [D-RI] 06/15/2011
Sen. Kirk, Mark Steven [R-IL] 06/16/2011
Sen. Schumer, Charles E. [D-NY] 06/21/2011
Sen. Sanders, Bernard [I-VT] 06/23/2011
Sen. Wyden, Ron [D-OR] 06/23/2011
Sen. Inhofe, James M. [R-OK] 06/23/2011
Sen. Coburn, Tom [R-OK] 06/23/2011
Sen. Lugar, Richard G. [R-IN] 06/27/2011
Sen. Begich, Mark [D-AK] 06/28/2011
Sen. Johnson, Tim [D-SD] 06/28/2011
Sen. Graham, Lindsey [R-SC] 06/30/2011
Sen. Lautenberg, Frank R. [D-NJ] 07/06/2011
Sen. Merkley, Jeff [D-OR] 07/06/2011
Sen. Collins, Susan M. [R-ME] 07/06/2011
Sen. Rubio, Marco [R-FL] 07/06/2011
Sen. Udall, Mark [D-CO] 07/06/2011
Sen. Blunt, Roy [R-MO] 07/11/2011
Sen. Akaka, Daniel K. [D-HI] 07/11/2011
Sen. Murray, Patty [D-WA] 07/11/2011
Sen. Coats, Daniel [R-IN] 07/12/2011
Sen. Boozman, John [R-AR] 07/13/2011
Sen. Hoeven, John [R-ND] 07/13/2011
Sen. Tester, Jon [D-MT] 07/13/2011
Sen. Mikulski, Barbara A. [D-MD] 07/14/2011
Sen. Stabenow, Debbie [D-MI] 07/14/2011
Sen. Isakson, Johnny [R-GA] 07/14/2011
Sen. Chambliss, Saxby [R-GA] 07/14/2011
Sen. Brown, Scott P. [R-MA] 07/18/2011
Sen. Johanns, Mike [R-NE] 07/18/2011
Sen. Murkowski, Lisa [R-AK] 07/18/2011
Sen. Risch, James E. [R-ID] 07/18/2011
Sen. Wicker, Roger F. [R-MS] 07/18/2011
Sen. Bennet, Michael F. [D-CO] 07/18/2011
Sen. Udall, Tom [D-NM] 07/18/2011
Sen. Burr, Richard [R-NC] 07/19/2011
Sen. Franken, Al [D-MN] 07/19/2011
Sen. Gillibrand, Kirsten E. [D-NY] 07/19/2011
Sen. Lieberman, Joseph I. [ID-CT] 07/19/2011
Sen. Shaheen, Jeanne [D-NH] 07/19/2011
Sen. Cantwell, Maria [D-WA] 07/19/2011
Sen. Kohl, Herb [D-WI] 07/19/2011
Sen. Blumenthal, Richard [D-CT] 07/20/2011
Sen. Casey, Robert P., Jr. [D-PA] 07/20/2011
Sen. Johnson, Ron [R-WI] 07/20/2011
Sen. Cornyn, John [R-TX] 07/21/2011
Sen. Portman, Rob [R-OH] 07/25/2011
Sen. Barrasso, John [R-WY] 07/27/2011
Sen. Sessions, Jeff [R-AL] 09/07/2011
Sen. Nelson, Bill [D-FL] 09/14/2011

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
Senate Finance05/26/2011 Referred to

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Subjects (7)


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for S.J.Res.17. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in Senate (05/26/2011)

Approves the renewal of certain import restrictions contained in the Burmese Freedom and Democracy Act of 2003.