Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Baucus, Max [D-MT]* 06/14/2011
Sen. Barrasso, John [R-WY]* 06/14/2011
Sen. Inhofe, James M. [R-OK]* 06/14/2011
Sen. Vitter, David [R-LA]* 06/14/2011
Sen. Lugar, Richard G. [R-IN]* 06/14/2011
Sen. Grassley, Chuck [R-IA]* 06/14/2011
Sen. Cornyn, John [R-TX] 06/15/2011
Sen. Blunt, Roy [R-MO] 06/15/2011
Sen. Enzi, Michael B. [R-WY] 06/15/2011
Sen. Graham, Lindsey [R-SC] 06/15/2011
Sen. Burr, Richard [R-NC] 06/20/2011
Sen. Sessions, Jeff [R-AL] 06/20/2011
Sen. Kyl, Jon [R-AZ] 06/20/2011
Sen. Coburn, Tom [R-OK] 06/21/2011
Sen. Johanns, Mike [R-NE] 06/21/2011
Sen. Nelson, Ben [D-NE] 06/22/2011
Sen. Isakson, Johnny [R-GA] 06/29/2011
Sen. Rubio, Marco [R-FL] 06/29/2011
Sen. Chambliss, Saxby [R-GA] 07/06/2011
Sen. Hutchison, Kay Bailey [R-TX] 07/07/2011
Sen. Thune, John [R-SD] 07/07/2011
Sen. Coats, Daniel [R-IN] 07/12/2011
Sen. Collins, Susan M. [R-ME] 07/13/2011
Sen. Roberts, Pat [R-KS] 07/25/2011
Sen. Rockefeller, John D., IV [D-WV] 09/06/2011
Sen. Heller, Dean [R-NV] 09/07/2011
Sen. Crapo, Mike [R-ID] 09/19/2011
Sen. Snowe, Olympia J. [R-ME] 09/22/2011
Sen. Boozman, John [R-AR] 10/17/2011
Sen. Ayotte, Kelly [R-NH] 01/30/2012
Sen. Hoeven, John [R-ND] 02/09/2012
Sen. Moran, Jerry [R-KS] 02/28/2012
Sen. Risch, James E. [R-ID] 02/29/2012
Sen. Stabenow, Debbie [D-MI] 05/08/2012
Sen. Johnson, Tim [D-SD] 05/17/2012
Sen. Toomey, Pat [R-PA] 07/17/2012
Sen. Cochran, Thad [R-MS] 11/13/2012