Text: S.J.Res.22 — 112th Congress (2011-2012)All Information (Except Text)

Text available as:

Shown Here:
Public Law No: 112-71 (12/19/2011)

 
[112th Congress Public Law 71]
[From the U.S. Government Printing Office]



[[Page 125 STAT. 775]]

Public Law 112-71
112th Congress

                            Joint Resolution


 
To grant the consent of Congress to an amendment to the compact between 
 the States of Missouri and Illinois providing that bonds issued by the 
       Bi-State Development Agency may mature in not to exceed 40 
            years. <<NOTE: Dec. 19, 2011 -  [S.J. Res. 22]>> 

    Resolved by the Senate and House of Representatives of the United 
States of America in Congress assembled, That

SECTION 1. CONSENT.

    (a) In General.--The consent of Congress is given to the amendment 
of the powers conferred on the Bi-State Development Agency by Senate 
Bill 758, Laws of Missouri 2010 and Public Act 96-1520 (Senate Bill 
3342), Laws of Illinois 2010.
    (b) Effective Date.--The amendment to the powers conferred by the 
Acts consented to in subsection (a) shall take effect on the date of 
enactment of this Act.

SEC. 2. APPLICATION OF ACT OF AUGUST 31, 1950.

    The provisions of the Act of August 31, 1950 (64 Stat. 568) shall 
apply to the amendment approved under this joint resolution to the same 
extent as if such amendment was conferred under the provisions of the 
compact consented to in such Act.

SEC. 3. RIGHT TO ALTER, AMEND, OR REPEAL.

    The right to alter, amend, or repeal this joint resolution is 
expressly reserved.

[[Page 125 STAT. 776]]

SEC. 4. RESERVATION OF RIGHTS.

    The right is reserved to Congress to require the disclosure and 
furnishings of such information or data by the Bi-State Development 
Agency as is deemed appropriate by Congress.

    Approved December 19, 2011.

LEGISLATIVE HISTORY--S.J. Res. 22 (H.J. Res. 70):
---------------------------------------------------------------------------

HOUSE REPORTS: No. 112-259 (Comm. on the Judiciary) accompanying 
H.J. Res. 70.
CONGRESSIONAL RECORD, Vol. 157 (2011):
            Sept. 26, considered and passed Senate.
            Dec. 6, considered and passed House, amended.
            Dec. 8, Senate concurred in House amendment.

                                  <all>