There are 2 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (1)

Official Titles

Official Titles - Senate

Official Titles as Introduced

A joint resolution providing for congressional disapproval under chapter 8 of title 5, United States Code, of the rule submitted by the National Labor Relations Board relating to representation election procedures.


Actions Overview (2)

Date
04/19/2012Senate Committee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions discharged by petition pursuant to 5 U.S.C. 803(c).(consideration: CR S2538; text: CR S2538)
02/16/2012Introduced in Senate

All Actions (7)

Date
04/24/2012Motion to proceed to consideration of measure rejected in Senate by Yea-Nay Vote. 45 - 54. Record Vote Number: 68.
Action By: Senate
04/24/2012Motion to proceed to measure considered in Senate. (consideration: CR S2616-2627, S2634)
Action By: Senate
04/23/2012Motion to proceed to consideration of measure made in Senate. (consideration: CR S2568-2579, S2603)
Action By: Senate
04/19/2012Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 361.
Action By: Senate
04/19/2012Senate Committee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions discharged by petition pursuant to 5 U.S.C. 803(c). (consideration: CR S2538; text: CR S2538)
Action By: Senate
02/16/2012Read twice and referred to the Committee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions.
Action By: Senate
02/16/2012Sponsor introductory remarks on measure. (CR S853-856)
Action By: Senate

Cosponsors (44)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Alexander, Lamar [R-TN]* 02/16/2012
Sen. Ayotte, Kelly [R-NH]* 02/16/2012
Sen. Barrasso, John [R-WY]* 02/16/2012
Sen. Blunt, Roy [R-MO]* 02/16/2012
Sen. Boozman, John [R-AR]* 02/16/2012
Sen. Burr, Richard [R-NC]* 02/16/2012
Sen. Chambliss, Saxby [R-GA]* 02/16/2012
Sen. Coats, Daniel [R-IN]* 02/16/2012
Sen. Coburn, Tom [R-OK]* 02/16/2012
Sen. Cochran, Thad [R-MS]* 02/16/2012
Sen. Collins, Susan M. [R-ME]* 02/16/2012
Sen. Corker, Bob [R-TN]* 02/16/2012
Sen. Cornyn, John [R-TX]* 02/16/2012
Sen. Crapo, Mike [R-ID]* 02/16/2012
Sen. DeMint, Jim [R-SC]* 02/16/2012
Sen. Graham, Lindsey [R-SC]* 02/16/2012
Sen. Grassley, Chuck [R-IA]* 02/16/2012
Sen. Hatch, Orrin G. [R-UT]* 02/16/2012
Sen. Heller, Dean [R-NV]* 02/16/2012
Sen. Hoeven, John [R-ND]* 02/16/2012
Sen. Hutchison, Kay Bailey [R-TX]* 02/16/2012
Sen. Inhofe, James M. [R-OK]* 02/16/2012
Sen. Isakson, Johnny [R-GA]* 02/16/2012
Sen. Johanns, Mike [R-NE]* 02/16/2012
Sen. Johnson, Ron [R-WI]* 02/16/2012
Sen. Kyl, Jon [R-AZ]* 02/16/2012
Sen. Lee, Mike [R-UT]* 02/16/2012
Sen. Lugar, Richard G. [R-IN]* 02/16/2012
Sen. McCain, John [R-AZ]* 02/16/2012
Sen. McConnell, Mitch [R-KY]* 02/16/2012
Sen. Moran, Jerry [R-KS]* 02/16/2012
Sen. Paul, Rand [R-KY]* 02/16/2012
Sen. Portman, Rob [R-OH]* 02/16/2012
Sen. Risch, James E. [R-ID]* 02/16/2012
Sen. Roberts, Pat [R-KS]* 02/16/2012
Sen. Rubio, Marco [R-FL]* 02/16/2012
Sen. Sessions, Jeff [R-AL]* 02/16/2012
Sen. Shelby, Richard C. [R-AL]* 02/16/2012
Sen. Snowe, Olympia J. [R-ME]* 02/16/2012
Sen. Thune, John [R-SD]* 02/16/2012
Sen. Toomey, Pat [R-PA]* 02/16/2012
Sen. Vitter, David [R-LA]* 02/16/2012
Sen. Wicker, Roger F. [R-MS]* 02/16/2012
Sen. Kirk, Mark Steven [R-IL] 03/14/2012

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
Senate Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions02/16/2012 Referred to
04/19/2012 Discharged from

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Subjects (5)


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for S.J.Res.36. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in Senate (02/16/2012)

Disapproves and nullifies the rule submitted by the National Labor Relations Board (NLRB) and published December 22, 2011, relating to representation election procedures.