Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Cochran, Thad [R-MS]* 03/21/2012
Sen. Wicker, Roger F. [R-MS]* 03/21/2012
Sen. Burr, Richard [R-NC]* 03/21/2012
Sen. Shelby, Richard C. [R-AL]* 03/21/2012
Sen. Coburn, Tom [R-OK] 03/27/2012
Sen. DeMint, Jim [R-SC] 04/18/2012
Sen. Collins, Susan M. [R-ME] 04/23/2012
Sen. Ayotte, Kelly [R-NH] 05/08/2012
Sen. Chambliss, Saxby [R-GA] 05/10/2012